Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 01/04/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/06/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/25/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/25/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/02/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 02/08/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/08/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/09/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/09/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/16/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/16/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/01/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/01/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/02/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/03/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/12/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/24/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/09/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/09/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/09/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/09/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/13/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/17/2005