Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/21/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/26/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/09/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 05/12/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/12/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/19/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/19/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/19/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/19/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/24/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/24/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/24/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/26/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/26/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/16/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/24/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/24/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/24/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/24/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/11/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/22/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/22/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/28/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/15/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/15/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/27/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/06/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 02/15/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/02/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/22/2006