Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/20/2005
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/20/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/11/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/09/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/14/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/18/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/21/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/13/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/13/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/26/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/05/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/05/2006