Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/10/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/10/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/10/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/10/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/10/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/17/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/17/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/24/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/24/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/24/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/24/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/24/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/24/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/24/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/24/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/08/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/08/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/27/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/30/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/14/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 07/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/14/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/21/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/15/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/22/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/22/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/07/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/04/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/04/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/04/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/04/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/04/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/04/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/04/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/04/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/04/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/04/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/18/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/18/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/15/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/15/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/16/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/14/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/14/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/14/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/02/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/02/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/15/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/25/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/19/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/20/2006