Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/25/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/30/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/11/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/14/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/18/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/18/2005