Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/14/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/21/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/21/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/25/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/25/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/25/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/30/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/30/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/30/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/11/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/11/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/11/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/11/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/12/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/14/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/18/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/18/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/18/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/28/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/16/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/09/2006