Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/14/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/26/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/28/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/09/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/09/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/19/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/25/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/26/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/06/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/21/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/27/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/17/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/10/2005

Show cosponsors who withdrew