Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/14/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/21/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/21/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/21/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/21/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/28/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/28/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/28/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/28/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/28/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/28/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/28/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/28/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/28/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/28/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/28/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/28/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/05/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/05/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/05/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/05/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/05/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/05/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/05/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/05/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/05/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/05/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 06/20/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/20/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/20/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/20/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/20/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/20/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/20/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/20/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/20/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/20/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/20/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/20/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/20/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/20/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/20/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/20/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/20/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/20/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/20/2005