Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/26/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/03/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/10/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/07/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/06/2005