Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/27/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/27/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/27/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/28/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/04/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/04/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/04/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/04/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/04/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/04/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/04/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 05/05/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/10/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/11/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/11/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/11/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/11/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/12/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/17/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/17/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/17/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/18/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/23/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/23/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/25/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/26/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/16/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/21/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/21/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/23/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/23/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/23/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/30/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/19/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/26/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/26/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/06/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/06/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/06/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/06/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/06/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/06/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/17/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/20/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/02/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 11/03/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/01/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/28/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/27/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/28/2006