Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 04/06/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/27/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/27/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/27/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/10/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/24/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/24/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/26/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/26/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/16/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/30/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/11/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 10/17/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/17/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/18/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/20/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/01/2005