Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/12/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/14/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/19/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 04/26/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/27/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/18/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/03/2005