Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/28/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/28/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/28/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/28/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/28/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/23/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/23/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/23/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/23/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/09/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/09/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/09/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/16/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/22/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/22/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/22/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/28/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/28/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/12/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/12/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/12/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/12/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/20/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/28/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/06/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/20/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/07/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 10/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/20/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/03/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/07/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/07/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 12/07/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/31/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/31/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/31/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/14/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/14/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/14/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/28/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/28/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/28/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/28/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/15/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/15/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/25/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/26/2006