Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/05/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/08/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/12/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/12/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/19/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/19/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/05/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/05/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/10/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/16/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/16/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/18/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/08/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/14/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/14/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/15/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/15/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/23/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/23/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/28/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/11/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/12/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/14/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/18/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/28/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/08/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/15/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/17/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/24/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/18/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/07/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/13/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 12/14/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 01/31/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/16/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/16/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/02/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/02/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/14/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/14/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/14/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/15/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/29/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/29/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/29/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/04/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/25/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/10/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/14/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/10/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/10/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/06/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/19/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/13/2006