Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/05/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/05/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/05/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/25/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/14/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/29/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/03/2006