Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/25/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 01/25/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/26/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 02/08/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/10/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/10/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/10/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/10/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/15/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/15/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/15/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/15/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/16/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/02/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/08/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/14/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/14/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/14/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/14/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/15/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/16/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/06/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/14/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/28/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/03/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/03/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/10/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/10/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 05/12/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/16/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/18/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/11/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/22/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/28/2006