Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/25/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/02/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/07/2006