Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/17/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/06/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/13/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/21/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/25/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/06/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/02/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/02/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/02/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 03/09/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/04/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/04/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/04/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/04/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/20/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/20/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/22/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/06/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/19/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/07/2006