Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 03/16/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/16/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/16/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/05/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/05/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/05/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/13/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/13/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/13/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/13/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/13/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/13/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/13/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/13/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 04/13/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/13/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/13/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 04/13/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/03/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/03/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/03/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/11/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/11/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/11/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/11/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/24/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/24/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/24/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/08/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/08/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/21/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/21/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/27/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/02/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/02/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 11/04/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/24/2006