Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/04/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 01/06/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/06/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/06/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/06/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/25/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/25/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/25/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/25/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/25/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/25/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 01/25/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 01/25/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 01/25/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/25/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/25/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/25/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/25/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 01/25/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 01/26/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/26/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/26/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/01/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/01/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/02/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/08/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/08/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/08/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/16/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/16/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/16/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/02/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/02/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/02/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/02/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/10/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/10/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/16/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/16/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/16/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/17/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/08/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/08/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/08/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/08/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/26/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/26/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/26/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/28/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/11/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/11/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/11/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/16/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/23/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/13/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/17/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/27/2006