Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/10/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/10/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/21/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/05/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/28/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/22/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/22/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/27/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/17/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/13/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/14/2006