Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/08/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/08/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/08/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/09/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/15/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/19/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/20/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/21/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/26/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/03/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/03/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/10/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/23/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/07/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/07/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/20/2005