Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 02/17/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/01/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/01/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/01/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/01/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/01/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/01/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/01/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/01/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/02/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/02/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/10/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/10/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/10/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/15/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/15/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/16/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/23/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/23/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/25/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/26/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/07/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/29/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/29/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/29/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/29/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/29/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/22/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/13/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/18/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 02/08/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/14/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/15/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/15/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/16/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/28/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/16/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/22/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/19/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/19/2006