Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/26/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/26/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/26/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/26/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/26/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/26/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/26/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/28/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/11/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/11/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/11/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/21/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/21/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/21/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/21/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/21/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/23/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/28/2005