Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/16/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/16/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/16/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/16/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/16/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/16/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/16/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/16/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/16/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/16/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/16/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/16/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/16/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/17/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/17/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/17/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/05/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/05/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/05/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/05/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/05/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/05/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/08/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/08/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/12/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/28/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/04/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/04/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/16/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/16/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/23/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/08/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/13/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/13/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/22/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/28/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/20/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/20/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/07/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/19/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/19/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/18/2006