Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 06/13/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 07/14/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 09/15/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/07/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/07/2005