Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/10/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/10/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/14/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/15/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/12/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/17/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/30/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/22/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/15/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/26/2006