Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/10/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/15/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/18/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/26/2005