Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/05/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 11/19/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/25/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 01/21/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/23/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/01/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/01/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/08/2004