Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 09/13/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/14/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/14/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/14/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/14/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/14/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/14/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/20/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/20/2004
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 09/20/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 09/21/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/22/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/22/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/22/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/22/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/23/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/23/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/23/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/23/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/23/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/23/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/23/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/23/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/27/2004
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/27/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/27/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/27/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/29/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/30/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/30/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/04/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/04/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/04/2004
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 10/04/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/04/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/04/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/04/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/05/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 10/07/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/07/2004
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/07/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/07/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/08/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/08/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 10/08/2004
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/11/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/16/2004