Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 04/11/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/11/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/28/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/30/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/30/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 04/30/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/30/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/30/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/06/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/06/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/08/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/08/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/08/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/14/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/14/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/14/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/14/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/14/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/14/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/14/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/14/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/14/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/14/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/19/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/19/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 05/19/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/19/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 05/19/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/19/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/22/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 05/22/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/22/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/22/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/22/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/09/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/09/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/09/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/17/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/25/2003