Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/18/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/18/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/18/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/19/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/10/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/11/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/23/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/23/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/25/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/26/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/22/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/23/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 01/20/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/23/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/21/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/03/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/17/2004