Refine your search

Date Major Actions
12/10/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-455.
12/10/2004 Signed by President.
11/29/2004 Presented to President.
11/20/2004 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H10217)
11/19/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR 11/20/2004 S11662)
11/19/2004 Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/30/2004 Introduced in Senate