Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 09/23/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/27/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/27/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/27/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/27/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/27/2004
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/28/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/28/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/30/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/04/2004