Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/22/2004
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 06/22/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/22/2004
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/22/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/22/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/07/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/12/2004
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/15/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/15/2004
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 09/22/2004