Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/11/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 05/11/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/18/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/20/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/03/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/07/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/16/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/16/2004