Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/27/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 04/27/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/27/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/27/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/04/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/06/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/11/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/15/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/21/2004
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/14/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 11/16/2004