Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/10/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 03/10/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/10/2004
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/28/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/03/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/03/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/14/2004