Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/09/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 02/10/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/10/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/11/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/11/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 02/11/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/11/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 02/24/2004
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/24/2004
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 02/24/2004
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/24/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/24/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 02/24/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/25/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 03/01/2004
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/01/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/03/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/26/2004
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/31/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/08/2004