Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/09/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/08/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/08/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/08/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/12/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/12/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/01/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/01/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/29/2004