Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/07/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/07/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/07/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 07/07/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/07/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/08/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/08/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/08/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/08/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/08/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 07/09/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/09/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/10/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/10/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/21/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/22/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/27/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 05/03/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/03/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/05/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/05/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/05/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/05/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/05/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 05/11/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/13/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 05/13/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 05/17/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/19/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/19/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/19/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/19/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/20/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/20/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/01/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/02/2004
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/14/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/16/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/16/2004
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/16/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/18/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/18/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/21/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/21/2004
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/06/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/20/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/21/2004
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/21/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/21/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/21/2004
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/21/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/09/2004
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/09/2004
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 09/27/2004