Refine your search

Date Major Actions
10/25/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-368.
10/25/2004 Signed by President.
10/13/2004 Presented to President.
10/08/2004 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9024-9025)
10/08/2004 Committee on Financial Services discharged.
09/09/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S9044)
09/09/2004 Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9043-9044)
06/27/2003 Introduced in Senate