Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/24/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/24/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 02/27/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/27/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/11/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 05/13/2004
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/03/2004