Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/23/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/24/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/24/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/25/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/09/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/09/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/23/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/03/2003