Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/23/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/23/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/03/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/03/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/03/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/03/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/04/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/05/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/05/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/05/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/05/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/24/2003