Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/23/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/23/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/23/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/09/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/16/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/16/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/08/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 07/24/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/31/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 01/20/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/26/2004