Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/19/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/19/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/21/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/21/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/21/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/23/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/02/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/02/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/04/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/05/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/05/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/09/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/12/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/15/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/15/2003