Text: H.Res.820 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/05/2004)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 108th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 820 Introduced in House (IH)]






108th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. RES. 820

  To congratulate Mojave Aerospace Ventures for winning the privately 
 funded $10,000,000 Ansari X Prize and commend the X Prize Foundation 
                     for spurring this achievement.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                            October 5, 2004

Mr. Rohrabacher (for himself, Mr. Boehlert, Mr. Smith of Michigan, Ms. 
Eddie Bernice Johnson of Texas, Mr. Gutknecht, Mr. Smith of Texas, Mr. 
 Ehlers, Mr. Hall, Mr. Feeney, Mr. Calvert, and Mr. Weldon of Florida) 
submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee 
                               on Science

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
  To congratulate Mojave Aerospace Ventures for winning the privately 
 funded $10,000,000 Ansari X Prize and commend the X Prize Foundation 
                     for spurring this achievement.

Whereas the Ansari X Prize competition was created to promote the emerging 
        commercial space transportation industry and inspire a new generation of 
        explorers by accelerating the development of low-cost space launch 
        vehicles for space exploration, tourism, science, and commerce;
Whereas the X Prize Foundation, headed by space entrepreneur Dr. Peter 
        Diamandis, offered a $10,000,000 prize to the first contestant to 
        privately finance, develop, and launch a spaceship capable of carrying 3 
        people to 100 kilometers (62.5 miles) above the Earth, returning safely 
        to Earth, and repeating the launch with the same ship within 2 weeks;
Whereas the Ansari X Prize inspired 26 teams from 7 nations to invest their 
        private funds and personal toil in pursuit of the dream of private space 
        flight;
Whereas Mojave Aerospace Ventures, led by aviation pioneer Burt Rutan and 
        software pioneer Paul Allen, designed and developed SpaceShipOne, the 
        winning entry in the Ansari X Prize competition;
Whereas on June 21, 2004, SpaceShipOne, piloted by Mike Melvill, accomplished 
        the first privately funded suborbital flight into space in the skies 
        above Mojave, California;
Whereas on September 29, 2004, SpaceShipOne, once again piloted by Mike Melvill, 
        successfully completed the first of 2 suborbital flights in pursuit of 
        the Ansari X Prize competition, flying to an altitude of 337,600 feet 
        (102.9 km); and
Whereas on October 4, 2004, SpaceShipOne, piloted by Brian Binney, successfully 
        completed the second of 2 suborbital flights in pursuit of the Ansari X 
        Prize less than one week later, flying to an altitude of 368,000 feet 
        (112.2 km), and thereby winning the Ansari X Prize competition: Now, 
        therefore, be it
    Resolved,  That the House of Representatives--
            (1) congratulates Mojave Aerospace Ventures, led by Burt 
        Rutan and Paul Allen, for winning the privately funded 
        $10,000,000 Ansari X Prize and inspiring the next generation of 
        space explorers to even greater heights;
            (2) commends the pilots of SpaceShipOne for their skill and 
        bravery; and
            (3) commends the founders of, contributors to, and 
        management of the X Prize Foundation for spurring this 
        achievement.
                                 <all>