Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/08/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/08/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/14/2004
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/06/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/08/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/14/2004