Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/03/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/03/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/17/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/17/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/17/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/17/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/17/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/17/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/17/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/17/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/17/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/17/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/17/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/17/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/17/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/17/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/17/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/17/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/17/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/17/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 03/17/2004
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/23/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/23/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/23/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/23/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/23/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/23/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/23/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/25/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/30/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/30/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/02/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/21/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/21/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/05/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/05/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/05/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/05/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/11/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/11/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/11/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/11/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/11/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/11/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/17/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/17/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/19/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/19/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/19/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/01/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/08/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/08/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/21/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/29/2004